Reagan cabinet staff
WebJun 26, 2024 · Updated June 26, 2024 Infoplease Staff. Secretary of State : William P. Rogers, 1969 Henry A. Kissinger, 1973: Secretary of the Treasury : David M. Kennedy, 1969 John B. Connally, 1971 George P. Shultz, 1972 ... Cabinet Members Under L. B. Johnson Cabinet Members with Dates of Appointment Cabinet Members Under Ford. Sources + … WebHoward H. Baker, Jr. March 1987-June 1988. Kenneth M. Duberstein. July 1988-January 20, 1989. During the first administration, Chief of Staff James A. Baker, Deputy Chief of Staff …
Reagan cabinet staff
Did you know?
WebMar 7, 2016 · So the next five weeks, the staff operation struggled to adjust while being torn by infighting. Sears wanted to follow his original strategy of protecting Reagan’s front-runner status, limiting ... WebFeb 20, 2010 · President Reagan, Vice President George H.W. Bush and the Reagan Cabinet in February 1981. Haig (lower left) was Reagan's first secretary of state. He resigned his post in June 1982.
WebJan 8, 2024 · As half of President Reagan’s cabinet sat in the Situation Room, and the other half in a makeshift command center at the hospital, they had to discuss the possibility of … WebFeb 15, 1981 · The Reagan plan would put the six Cabinet councils under the respective leadership of the Secretaries of State, Treasury, Interior, Health and Human Services, Commerce and Agriculture to develop ...
WebJames Scott Brady (August 29, 1940 – August 4, 2014) was an American public official who served as assistant to the U.S. president and the 17th White House Press Secretary, serving under President Ronald Reagan.In … WebFeb 7, 2024 · A lifelong Republican, Shultz held three major Cabinet positions in GOP administrations during a lengthy career of public service. He was labor secretary, treasury secretary, and director of the Office of Management and Budget under President Richard M. Nixon before spending more than six years as President Ronald Reagan’s secretary of state.
In 1993, Baker became the honorary chair of the James A. Baker III Institute of Public Policy at Rice University in Houston, Texas. Also in 1993, the Enron Corporation hired Baker as a consultant within a month of his departure from the White House, and Enron said that Baker would have an opportunity to invest in any projects he developed. During his time at Enron, Ba…
WebJan 13, 2024 · The cabinet of President Ronald Reagan in February 1981. Ronald Reagan Library During his first presidential campaign, Mr. Clinton said he would have a cabinet … pacifico pizzeria \u0026 ristorante vancouverWebEdwin Meese. Edwin Meese III (born December 2, 1931) is an American attorney, law professor, author and member of the Republican Party who served in official capacities within the Ronald Reagan gubernatorial administration (1967–1974), the Reagan presidential transition team (1980–81) and the Reagan administration (1981–1985). pacifico pro fontpacific orca corporationWebFeb 20, 2010 · Feb. 20, 2010. Alexander M. Haig Jr., the four-star general who served as a confrontational secretary of state under President Ronald Reagan and a commanding White House chief of staff as the ... イロハ 順序WebSecretary of Agriculture Deputy Secretary of Agriculture ; John R. Block: 1981-1986: Richard E. Lyng: 1981-1985: Richard E. Lyng: 1986 -1989: Peter C. Myers: 1986-1989 イロハ 順番WebJan 13, 2024 · The cabinet of President Ronald Reagan in February 1981. Ronald Reagan Library During his first presidential campaign, Mr. Clinton said he would have a cabinet that “ looks like America .” pacific oregon tennisWebMar 25, 2011 · March 25, 2011. President Reagan had been in office only 70 days when John Hinckley Jr.’s shot cut him down outside the Washington Hilton. Vice President George H.W. Bush was on a plane over ... pacific oral surgery simi valley ca